VA HB1594 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1594

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance; mandated coverage for hearing aids for minors. Requires health insurers, health maintenance organizations, and corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts to provide coverage for hearing aids and related services for children 18 years of age or younger when a licensed audiologist prescribes such hearing aids and related services. The coverage includes one hearing aid per hearing-impaired ear, up to a cost of $1,500, every 24 months. The measure applies to policies, contracts, and plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2021. Health insurance; mandated coverage for hearing aids for minors. Requires health insurers, health maintenance organizations, and corporations providing health care coverage subscription contracts to provide coverage for hearing aids and related services for children 18 years of age or younger when a licensed audiologist prescribes such hearing aids and related services. The coverage includes one hearing aid per hearing-impaired ear, up to a cost of $1,500, every 24 months. The measure applies to policies, contracts, and plans delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on and after January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; mandated coverage for hearing aids for minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Labor and Commerce
2020-02-06HouseContinued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-31HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 20105878D

Same As/Similar To

HB1594 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3823418.18(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback