VA HB1590 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Duty of care to law-enforcement officers and firefighters; fireman's rule. Provides that the common-law doctrine known as the fireman's rule, as described in the bill, shall not be a defense to certain claims. The fireman's rule is based on assumption of the usual risks of injury in such employment, whether caused by a negligent or a nonnegligent act of the defendant.
Title
Duty of care to law-enforcement officers and firefighters; fireman's rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1590ER) |
2017-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 17105562D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1590S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105562D-S1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105562D-S1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102558D |
Subjects
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police
Professions and Occupations
Firefighters and Fire Marshals
Law-Enforcement Officers
Police
Professions and Occupations