VA HB1589 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Lottery Board; repeal prohibition against sale of lottery tickets over the Internet; regulation of the manufacturing, distributing, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices; penalties. Renames the Virginia Lottery as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Department and the Virginia Lottery Board as the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board. The bill authorizes the manufacture, distribution, hosting, and playing of electronic gaming devices in the Commonwealth, to be regulated by the Virginia Lottery and Gaming Oversight Board. The bill specifies the licensing requirements for the manufacture, distribution, and hosting of electronic gaming devices and imposes criminal and civil penalties for violations of the law and regulations related to electronic gaming devices. The bill prohibits any host location licensee from offering more than five electronic gaming devices to the public for play at such host location's establishment and allows for a maximum of 15,000 electronic gaming devices in the Commonwealth. The bill imposes a 35 percent tax on all gross profits from the play of electronic gaming devices and provides for disbursement of the tax proceeds. The bill also establishes the Problem Gambling Treatment and Support Fund, administered by the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, to provide counseling and other support services for compulsive and problem gamblers, develop problem gambling treatment and prevention programs, and provide grants to support organizations that provide assistance to compulsive and problem gamblers. The bill authorizes the Lottery to sell tickets over the Internet. Under current law, it is prohibited from doing so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Lottery Board; regulation of electronic gaming devices, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in General Laws
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 20105636D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.016(n/a)See Bill Text
182334.3(n/a)See Bill Text
182340.22(n/a)See Bill Text
192389(n/a)See Bill Text
222905(n/a)See Bill Text
223114(n/a)See Bill Text
223202(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.3(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.7(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
224002(n/a)See Bill Text
22419(n/a)See Bill Text
372304(n/a)See Bill Text
372314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5813(n/a)See Bill Text
581302(n/a)See Bill Text
581322.02(n/a)See Bill Text
5814000(n/a)See Bill Text
5814002(n/a)See Bill Text
5814003(n/a)See Bill Text
5814006(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007(n/a)See Bill Text
5814007.2(n/a)See Bill Text
5814008(n/a)See Bill Text
5814009(n/a)See Bill Text
5814011(n/a)See Bill Text
5814012(n/a)See Bill Text
5814020.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5814025(n/a)See Bill Text
5814027(n/a)See Bill Text
5814030(n/a)See Bill Text
5814056(n/a)See Bill Text
581460(n/a)See Bill Text
591148.3(n/a)See Bill Text
801195.11(n/a)See Bill Text
91101(n/a)See Bill Text
91801(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback