VA HB1589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recount procedures; questioned ballots. Provides that a recount court may rule only on those questioned ballots whose validity was challenged during the recount of the precinct. At the conclusion of the recount of each precinct, the number of ballots for which there is a question regarding the ballot's validity shall be recorded by the recount officials at the same time that the number of valid ballots cast is recorded.
Title
Recount procedures; questioned ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105152D |