VA HB1587 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; security of certain records. Provides that information contained in engineering and construction drawings and plans for any single-family residential dwelling submitted for the purpose of complying with the Uniform Statewide Building Code (§ 36-97 et seq.) or the Statewide Fire Prevention Code (§ 27-94 et seq.) shall be confidential and shall not be subject to disclosure under the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (§ 2.2-3700 et seq.), except to the applicant or the owner of the property upon the applicant's or owner's request.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; security of certain records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1587ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101163D-E |
2017-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1587E |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101163D |