VA HB1586 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1133)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; allocation of funds. Provides that increases in service approved by the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Board shall not be included in the calculation of the annual increase in total operating expenses included in an approved WMATA budget.
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; allocation of funds.
Sponsors
Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Mark Sickles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (6-Y 5-N) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 23-N) (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1133) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1133 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1586ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (6-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 23-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105593D-E |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1586E |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105593D |