VA HB1586 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Court-ordered custody and visitation arrangements; transmission of order to child's school. Provides that, in any custody or visitation case in which an order prohibiting a party from picking a child up from school is entered, the court shall order a party to provide a copy of such order to the child's school within three business days of the receipt of the order. The bill requires that, where a custody determination affects a child's school enrollment, the court order a party to provide a copy of the custody order to the child's new school within three business days of the child's enrollment. The bill further provides that if the court determines that a party is unable to deliver the order to the school, such party shall provide the court with the name of the principal and address of the school, and the court shall cause the order to be mailed to such principal.
Title
Court-ordered custody and visitation arrangements; transmission of order to child's school.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0509) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 509 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1586ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 2-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1586H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104442D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104442D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101164D |