VA HB1582 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Concealed handgun permits; age requirement for persons on active military duty. Allows a person at least 18 years of age but less than 21 years of age to apply for a concealed handgun permit if he is on active military duty or has received an honorable discharge from the United States Armed Forces or the Virginia National Guard and has completed basic training as a part of his military service. The bill allows reciprocity under the same circumstances for a nonresident who carries a concealed handgun or weapons permit recognized in the Commonwealth. Current law requires that residents and nonresidents be at least 21 years of age to carry a concealed handgun.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed handgun permits; age requirement for persons on active military duty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 19-N) (Y: 78 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05House(67 affirmative votes required to override)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 32-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto (66-Y 32-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-22HousePassed by until Wednesday, April 5, 2017
2017-02-21 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-02-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017
2017-02-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17
2017-02-13SenateSigned by President
2017-02-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-10HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1582ER)
2017-02-10HouseEnrolled
2017-02-08SenatePassed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2017-02-08SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenatePassed Senate (23-Y 16-N)
2017-02-08SenateRead third time
2017-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-18HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 19-N)
2017-01-18HouseRead third time and passed House (78-Y 19-N)
2017-01-17HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1582H1
2017-01-17HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104113D-H1
2017-01-17HouseRead second time
2017-01-16HouseRead first time
2017-01-13HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104113D-H1
2017-01-13HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
2017-01-12HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2017-01-10HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2017-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102458D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.013(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.014(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.02(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.06(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1582
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1582+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1582H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1582ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1501V0009+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H15V0005+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1482+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0213+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0390HB1582+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0422HB1582+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0425HB1582+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0426HB1582+HB1582
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2853+HB1582

Bill Comments

feedback