VA HB1582 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Armed security officers; protection of schools and child day centers. Permits any armed security officers licensed by the Department of Criminal Justice Services to carry firearms onto private or religious school property if such officer is hired by the private or religious school to provide protection to students and employees. The bill also prohibits the Board of Social Services from adopting any regulations that would prevent a child day center from hiring an armed security officer.
Title
Armed security officers; protection of schools and child day centers.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Terry Kilgore [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] |
Del. Margaret Ransone [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 18-N) (Y: 83 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2013-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1582ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 18-N) |
2013-02-13 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (81-Y 18-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 6-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (13-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1582H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104252D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104252D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103101D |