VA HB1580 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Bar exam; preservation of examination papers; copies available to applicant. Allows an applicant who failed the bar exam to obtain copies of the essay questions and his answers by written request within 60 days after notice of failure and for a reasonable fee.
Title
Bar exam; preservation of examination papers, copies available to applicant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101428D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1580 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1580+hil |