VA HB1579 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1579
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Presumption of death; missing person report. Provides that a person who is a resident of the Commonwealth shall be presumed dead if such person disappears for two successive years, his body has not been found, he is not known to be alive, and a missing person report has been issued for him by a local law-enforcement agency.
Title
Presumption of death; missing person report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105392D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1579 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1579 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1579+hil |