VA HB1578 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DNA data bank; State Police to verify receipt of samples from persons on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. Requires the Department of State Police to verify receipt of DNA samples by the Department of Forensic Science for persons required to register on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. The bill also requires the State Police to obtain a DNA sample for such persons if one has not been received by the Department of Forensic Science.
Title
DNA data bank; State Police to verify receipt of samples from persons on the Sex Offender Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1578ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101853D |