VA HB1572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial development authorities; Town of Front Royal. Provides that the Town of Front Royal may create its own independent industrial development authority, separate and apart for all purposes from any currently existing or future industrial development authority with all powers granted industrial development authorities generally. The current law does not explicitly allow for this due to the town's previous joint arrangement with Warren County. Such industrial development authority may also include Warren County in any of its economic development projects for a period of five years ending July 1, 2025.
Title
Front Royal, Town of; industrial development authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1001) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1001 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1572ER) |
2020-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20104988D-E |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1572E |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2020-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104988D |