VA HB1568 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; small business development programs. Transfers the administration of the Small Business Jobs Grant Fund Program and the Small Business Investment Grant Fund from the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity to the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business and Supplier Diversity, Department of; small business development programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 48-N) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseHouse sustained Governor's veto
2018-04-09 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2018-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1568ER)
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107753D-S1 (51-Y 46-N)
2018-03-07HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
2018-03-07HouseRequires 51 votes for passage
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 48-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 18107753D-S1 (49-Y 48-N)
2018-03-06HousePassed by for the day
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-05SenatePassed Senate with substitute (24-Y 16-N)
2018-03-05SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1568S1
2018-03-05SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107753D-S1
2018-03-05SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-05SenateRead third time
2018-03-02SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107753D-S1
2018-02-28SenateReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House (51-Y 49-N)
2018-02-12HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 10-N)
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105451D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011425.7(n/a)See Bill Text
1524904(n/a)See Bill Text
152965.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221603(n/a)See Bill Text
221604(n/a)See Bill Text
221605(n/a)See Bill Text
221606(n/a)See Bill Text
221608(n/a)See Bill Text
221610(n/a)See Bill Text
221611(n/a)See Bill Text
221616(n/a)See Bill Text
221617(n/a)See Bill Text
22203.2:4(n/a)See Bill Text
22204(n/a)See Bill Text
22205.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222238.1(n/a)See Bill Text
222240.7(n/a)See Bill Text
222240.8(n/a)See Bill Text
222282(n/a)See Bill Text
222284(n/a)See Bill Text
222311.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223705.6(n/a)See Bill Text
224302.1(n/a)See Bill Text
224302.2(n/a)See Bill Text
224310(n/a)See Bill Text
224310.1(n/a)See Bill Text
2312627(n/a)See Bill Text
32201(n/a)See Bill Text
3321509(n/a)See Bill Text
462749.69:1(n/a)See Bill Text
632601(n/a)See Bill Text
632610(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1568
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1568+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1568S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1568ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0201V0020+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0028+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0760+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S05V0370+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0829HB1568+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0910HB1568+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1450+HB1568
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1462+HB1568

Bill Comments

feedback