VA HB1566 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Professions and occupations; regulatory boards. Establishes a statewide policy for the regulation of professions and occupations specifying criteria for government regulation with the objective of increasing opportunities, promoting competition, encouraging innovation, protecting consumers, and complying with applicable federal antitrust laws. The bill also establishes the position of professional and occupational regulatory analyst within the Division of Legislative Services to assist the Joint Commission on Administrative Rules in (i) evaluating at least three professions and occupations in each year and (ii) to the extent feasible, reviewing legislation establishing or modifying an occupational regulation to determine whether the legislation meets the state policy of using the least restrictive regulation necessary to protect or preserve the public health, safety, and welfare. The evaluation shall include recommendations for changes to occupational regulations to improve compliance with the state policy of using the least restrictive regulation necessary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; active supervision of regulatory boards, definitions, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment #5 (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 34-N) (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 6-N) (Y: 10 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-25HouseFailed to pass
2017-02-25HouseNo further action taken
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Ruff, Vogel, Wagner
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Webert, Anderson, Bourne
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendment #5 (37-Y 3-N)
2017-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 95-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment #5 rejected by House (0-Y 95-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 34-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendments #1, 2, 3 and 4 agreed to by House (61-Y 34-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amendments (21-Y 19-N)
2017-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-17SenateFinance Committee amendment agreed to
2017-02-17SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-17SenateRules Committee amendments agreed to
2017-02-17SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-17SenateRead third time
2017-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Finance with amendment (10-Y 6-N)
2017-02-10SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-10SenateReported from Rules with amendments (11-Y 3-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (63-Y 33-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1566H2
2017-02-06HouseAppropriations Committee substitute agreed to 17105203D-H2
2017-02-06HouseGeneral Laws Committee substitute rejected 17104901D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-04HouseRead first time
2017-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 17105203D-H2
2017-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (13-Y 7-N)
2017-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseAssigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104901D-H1
2017-01-31HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2017-01-11HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-01HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100652D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22525(n/a)See Bill Text
541100(n/a)See Bill Text
541100.01(n/a)See Bill Text
541100.04(n/a)See Bill Text
541100.1(n/a)See Bill Text
541300(n/a)See Bill Text
541311(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1566
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1566+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1566H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1566H2+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0053+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0080+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0201V0016+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0075+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2065+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S10V0093+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0284+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0627HB1566+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0658HB1566+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2580+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2581+HB1566
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0824HB1566+HB1566

Bill Comments

feedback