VA HB1562 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dam Safety, Flood Prevention and Protection Assistance Fund. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Conservation and Recreation to disburse moneys from the Dam Safety, Flood Prevention and Protection Assistance Fund in the form of grants or loans to a local government that owns a dam, to a local government for a dam located within the locality, or to a private entity that owns a dam in order to protect public safety and welfare. The grants can be used for the design, repair, and safety modifications of dams identified in safety reports.
Title
Dam Safety, Flood Prevention and Protection Assistance Fund; grants from Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N) (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) (Y: 91 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0245) | |
2017-02-24 | House | Enacted, Chapter 245 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1562ER2) |
2017-02-24 | House | Reenrolled |
2017-02-24 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1562ER) |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1562H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104371D-H1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104371D-H1 |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2016-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102065D |
Subjects
Conservation
Counties Cities and Towns
Dams
Local Government and Officials
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors
Counties Cities and Towns
Dams
Local Government and Officials
Waters of the State Ports and Harbors