VA HB1562 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic identity management; standards; liability. Creates the Identity Management Standards Advisory Council to advise the Secretaries of Technology and Transportation on the adoption of technical and data standards regarding the verification and authentication of identity in digital and online transactions. The bill establishes in the Code of Virginia the concept of an identity trust framework operator, an entity that establishes rules and policies for identity providers operating within the framework and issues electronic trustmarks to such providers signifying compliance with the rules and policies of that trust framework. The bill also establishes limitation on liability for providers that adhere to the adopted standards, the applicable contract terms, and the rules and policies of the identity trust framework provider, absent gross negligence or willful misconduct. The bill provides that the provider's adherence to the adopted standards and applicable contract terms of the identity framework shall satisfy any requirement for a commercially reasonable security or attribution procedure under Title 8.4A (Commercial Code), the Uniform Electronic Transactions Act (§ 59.1-479 et seq.), and the Uniform Computer Information Transactions Act (§ 59.1-501.1 et seq.).
Title
Electronic identity management; standards, liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 29-N 1-A) (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0482) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 482 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1562ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (67-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (67-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (12-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1562H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104252D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104252D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-19 | House | Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2015-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101791D |
Same As/Similar To
SB814 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 435.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |