VA HB1561 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Contracts; sexual assault and harassment; enforceability. Contracts; sexual assault and harassment; enforceability. Provides that any provision in a contract or agreement by which a party waives a claim of sexual assault or harassment or agrees to nondisclosure of such a claim is unconscionable and against public policy and void and unenforceable unless the waiver is in writing and the waiving party consulted with counsel who approved the waiver or the court approved the waiver.
Title
Settlement agreements; indemnification provision declared void & waiver of sexual harassment claim.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18105550D |