VA HB1561 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public school buses; seat belts. Requires the Board of Education to make regulations to require each new public school bus purchased for the transportation of students to be equipped with a seat belt in every seat. The bill requires each school board to ensure that no later than July 1, 2027, each school bus that it uses for the transportation of students is equipped with a seat belt in every seat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public school buses; seat belts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-10HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #2
2016-12-29HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2016-12-29HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102586D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221177(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback