VA HB156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and the Critical National Security Language Grant Program within the Department of Education for the purpose of awarding grants on a competitive basis to any school division that provides a foreign language course in a foreign language that is currently identified as critical by the National Security Language Initiative for Youth scholarship program. Such grants are limited to $5,000 per student who successfully completes a critical foreign language course per school year.
Title
Critical National Security Language Grant Fund and Program; created and established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2019-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101970D |