VA HB1554 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; Mental Health First Aid training. Requires each school board to adopt and implement policies that require each teacher and other relevant personnel, as determined by the school board, who are employed on a full-time basis to complete a Mental Health First Aid training or similar program every three years. The bill requires each school board to provide such training and allows a school board to contract with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, a community services board, a behavioral health authority, a nonprofit organization, or a certified trainer of the Mental Health First Aid training program to provide such training.
Title
Public schools; Mental Health First Aid training every three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Incorporated by Education |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB74-Kory) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2020-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105069D |
Same As/Similar To
HB76 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1554 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1554+hil |