VA HB1553 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Admissions tax in Washington County. Clarifies that Washington County is authorized to impose an admissions tax to either a multi-sports complex or an entertainment venue, or both, subject to certain requirements. This bill is identical to SB 503.
Title
Admissions tax; Washington County authorized to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0287) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 287 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1553ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104068D |