VA HB1551 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special Workforce Grant Fund; creation. Creates the Special Workforce Grant Fund to award grants to certain e-commerce companies that make a capital investment at a facility in Fairfax County of at least $84 million and create at least 1,500 new full-time jobs at such facility. The grants would be paid out over a period of three years on the basis of investment and job-creation progress. The total aggregate amount of grants that may be paid is $10.5 million.
Title
Special Workforce Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 744 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1551ER) |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104222D |