VA HB155 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clinics for the treatment of opioid addiction; location. Provides that the prohibition on locating clinics for the treatment of persons with opiate addiction through the use of methadone or opioid replacements other than opioid replacements approved for the treatment of opioid addiction by the U.S. Food and Drug Administration within one-half mile of a public or private licensed day care center or a public or private K-12 school shall not apply to an applicant for a license to operate in its current location if the facility is within one-half mile of a public or private licensed day care center or a public or private K-12 school in Henrico County, the City of Richmond, or the City of Newport News and has been licensed and operated as a facility to provide treatment for persons with opiate addiction through the use of methadone or other opioid replacements by another provider immediately prior to submission of the application for a license.
Title
Opioids; location of clinic for treatment of addiction in Henrico Cty., City of Newport News, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0816) | |
2018-04-18 | House | Enacted, Chapter 816 (effective 7/1/18) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB155ER2) |
2018-04-18 | House | Reenrolled |
2018-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-04-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-04-18 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB155ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107204D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB155S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107204D-S1 |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107204D-S1 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100826D-E |
2018-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB155E |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-12-20 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100826D |