VA HB1547 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity with the Internal Revenue Code; cannabis licensees. Deconforms from federal law, as it applies to Virginia medical and recreational cannabis licensees, the prohibition on a deduction for any amount paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on any trade or business if such trade or business consists of trafficking in a controlled substance prohibited by federal law.
Title
Cannabis; deconforms from federal law, licensees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102782D |