VA HB1547 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; eligibility for in-state tuition. Provides that any student is eligible for in-state tuition who (i) attended high school for at least two years in the Commonwealth and either (a) graduated on or after July 1, 2008, from a public or private high school or program of home instruction in the Commonwealth or (b) passed, on or after July 1, 2008, a high school equivalency examination approved by the Secretary of Education; (ii) has submitted evidence that he or, in the case of a dependent student, at least one parent, guardian, or person standing in loco parentis has filed, unless exempted by state law, Virginia income tax returns for at least two years prior to the date of registration or enrollment; and (iii) registers as an entering student or is enrolled in a public institution of higher education in the Commonwealth. The bill states that students who meet these criteria shall be eligible for in-state tuition regardless of their citizenship or immigration status, except students with currently valid visas issued under 8 U.S.C. § 1101(a)(15)(F), 1101(a)(15)(H)(iii), 1101(a)(15)(J) (including only students or trainees), or 1101(a)(15)(M). Information obtained in the implementation of the provisions of the bill shall only be used or disclosed to individuals other than the student for purposes of determining in-state tuition eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; eligibility for in-state tuition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 42-N) (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-04SenateSigned by President
2020-03-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-03HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1547ER)
2020-03-03HouseEnrolled
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20109044D-S1 (52-Y 42-N)
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1547S1
2020-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109044D-S1
2020-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-26SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 42-N)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109044D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 3-N 1-A)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1547H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106046D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2020-02-03HouseIncorporates HB1138 (Keam)
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106046D-H1
2020-02-03HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseReported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N)
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2020-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20105441D

Same As/Similar To

HB1138 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Incorporated by Education
SB935 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231506.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1547&201+sum+HB1547
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1547+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1547H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1547S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1547ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0766+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0902V0024+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0107+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0206V0006+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0206V0007+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0232+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0275+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0802+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0316+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1395+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB1547+HB1547
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1089HB1547+HB1547

Bill Comments

feedback