VA HB1545 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1545

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Discretionary sentencing guideline midpoints; act of domestic terrorism enhancement. Provides that in addition to any increase in the midpoint of an initial recommended sentencing range already calculated for a defendant's criminal history, a defendant who commits an act of domestic terrorism, as defined in the bill, shall have the midpoint of the recommended sentencing range for his offense further increased by 200 percent in all cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discretionary sentencing guideline midpoints; act of domestic terrorism enhancement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-07HouseContinued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
2020-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-02-06HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20100863D

Same As/Similar To

HB1545 (Carry Over) 2020-02-07 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171805.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback