VA HB1544 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Strip searches of children. Provides that no child under the age of 18 shall be strip searched or subjected to a search of any body cavity by a law-enforcement officer or a jail officer. The bill provides exceptions for (i) children committed to the Department of Juvenile Justice or confined or detained in a secure local facility for juveniles or a jail or other facility for the detention of adults; (ii) persons taken into custody by or remanded to a law-enforcement officer pursuant to a circuit or district court order; and (iii) children in custodial arrest when there is reasonable cause to believe on the part of a law-enforcement officer or jail officer authorizing the search that the child is concealing a weapon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; strip searches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1236)
2020-04-22HouseEnacted, Chapter 1236 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-04-22SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1544ER2)
2020-04-22HouseReenrolled
2020-04-22 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
2020-04-22SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseVOTE: (95-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2020-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-04-11HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1544ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference substitute printed 20109446D-H2
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenators: Morrissey, Peake, Boysko
2020-03-03SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-02HouseDelegates: Carter, Scott, Bell
2020-03-02HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-02HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-02-28SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-02-28SenateSenate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-26HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N)
2020-02-26HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20108762D-S1 (0-Y 96-N)
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-24SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1544S1
2020-02-24SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108762D-S1
2020-02-24SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-24SenateRead third time
2020-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108762D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1544H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107738D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107738D-H1
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20104342D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19259.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1544&201+sum+HB1544
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1544ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1236+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0801V0036+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H08V0180+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0774+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0405+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0846HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0863HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1421+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1224HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1968+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1734HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2007HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2044HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV2045HB1544+HB1544
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2145+HB1544

Bill Comments

feedback