VA HB1543 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage and workers' compensation; inmates as employees. Requires the entity that operates the correctional facility at which an inmate performs labor to be paid therefor at a rate not less than the Commonwealth's minimum wage. The measure also provides that, for purposes of the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act, an inmate is an employee of the entity operating the correctional facility where the inmate participates in any work program during his incarceration.
Title
Minimum wage and workers' compensation; inmates as employees.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-06 | House | Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104443D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1543 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Continued to 2021 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1 | 28.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |