VA HB1541 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Care of agricultural animals by owner; penalty. Provides standards of care specifically for agricultural animals that ensure accommodation for customary farming activities. An owner of an agricultural animal is required to provide feed to prevent malnourishment, water to prevent dehydration and veterinary treatment as needed to address impairment of health or bodily function when such impairment cannot be otherwise addressed through animal husbandry. The bill also clarifies certain procedures for the seizure and impoundment of agricultural animals. It allows agricultural animals whose owner has not met the new adequate care standards to be sold by a local governing body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural animals; care by owner, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 12-N) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-28 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0754)
2011-03-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 754 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-24 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-24 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-24 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1541ER)
2011-02-24 House: Enrolled
2011-02-18 House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 12-N)
2011-02-18 House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (82-Y 12-N)
2011-02-17 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-16 Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-16 Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended
2011-02-16 Senate: Committee amendments agreed to
2011-02-16 Senate: Reading of amendments waived
2011-02-16 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-15 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-14 Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2011-02-01 Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2011-02-01 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-01-31 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2011-01-28 House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1541H1
2011-01-28 House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104049D-H1
2011-01-28 House: Read second time
2011-01-27 House: Read first time
2011-01-26 House: Committee substitute printed 11104049D-H1
2011-01-26 House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2011-01-24 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2011-01-18 House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture
2010-12-30 House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2010-12-30 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100322D

Same As/Similar To

SB1026 (Same As) 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0886)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text
326503.1(n/a)See Bill Text
326569(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1541
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1541+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1541H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1541ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0754+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H0101V0001+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H01V0056+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0300+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S01V0084+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0421HB1541+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0432HB1541+HB1541
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1108+HB1541

Bill Comments

feedback