VA HB1540 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Behavioral health providers; barrier crimes; exceptions. Adds additional crimes to the list of barrier crimes for which an exception is available in the case of employment with an adult substance abuse or mental health program at community services boards and private providers of behavioral health services licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill also allows the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services to hire individuals convicted of various barrier crimes in a position of employment at a state facility if the Department determines that the individual has been rehabilitated successfully and is not a risk to individuals receiving services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral health providers; barrier crimes, exceptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (33-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendments (33-Y 5-N)
2020-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-18SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2020-02-18SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-18SenateRead third time
2020-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-14SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2020-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (89-Y 10-N)
2020-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 10-N)
2020-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1540H1
2020-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106599D-H1
2020-02-06HouseRead second time
2020-02-05HouseRead first time
2020-02-04HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106599D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20103018D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372314(n/a)See Bill Text
372416(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback