VA HB1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Civic Education; sunset; membership. Extends the sunset provision of the Commission on Civic Education from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2020. The bill also increases the Commission's membership from 15 to 19 by adding one member of the House of Delegates, one member of the Senate, and two nonlegislative citizen members.
Title
Civic Education, Commission on; extends sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Norment, Reeves |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Delegates: Landes, Ware, Bagby |
2018-03-08 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-08 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1540H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105855D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105855D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104510D |