VA HB154 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-25 - Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public records Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public records database. Requires the establishment of a publicly available, centralized database for all public records. All public bodies will be required to transfer any public records in its possession to the database. The bill directs Virginia Information Technologies Agency (VITA), in consultation with the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council, to (i) convene a workgroup consisting of representatives from state and local public bodies in every region of the Commonwealth to conduct research, evaluate data, and determine a plan for implementation of the database and (ii) report its recommendations to the Governor and the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology on or before December 1, 2022. The provisions of the bill that establish the central public records database shall become effective on July 1, 2023, and the provisions of the bill requiring every public body to submit its public records to VITA for inclusion in the central public records database shall become effective on January 1, 2024.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; public records database.
Sponsors
Del. Marie March [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House: Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Stricken from docket by General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101857D |