VA HB1539 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms. Establishes insurance, taxation, recordkeeping, disclosure, and safety recall requirements for peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, defined in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; establishes requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107442D-H1
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
2020-01-31HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-01-27HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-27HouseReferred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
2020-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-16HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20104390D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3822204(n/a)See Bill Text
4621408(n/a)See Bill Text
4621415(n/a)See Bill Text
462711(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5811735(n/a)See Bill Text
5811745(n/a)See Bill Text
5811748(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.29(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.31(n/a)See Bill Text
591207.32(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback