VA HB1539 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms. Establishes insurance, taxation, recordkeeping, disclosure, and safety recall requirements for peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, defined in the bill.
Title
Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; establishes requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107442D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred from Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20104390D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 908.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1735 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1748 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |