VA HB1539 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sale of motor vehicles on consignment. Provides that a "supplemental sales location" license is not required for a licensed motor vehicle dealer, licensed T&M dealer, licensed trailer dealer, or licensed motorcycle dealer to sell vehicles, trailers, or motorcycles on consignment at wholesale auctions. The bill also allows the consignment sale of vehicles, trailers, or motorcycles that fail to pass safety inspection if the buyer is provided a written disclosure of that failure.
Title
Motor vehicles; certain vehicle dealers not required to display license at wholesale auction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0247) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 247 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1539ER) |
2013-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1539H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104113D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104113D-H1 |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #4 |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103094D |