VA HB1539 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Tolls on Dulles Toll Road and Dulles Greenway. Requires advance approval of any tolls for use of the Dulles Toll Road or Dulles Greenway by every local governing body of every county, city, and town through which the facility passes.
Title
Tolls on Dulles Toll Road and Dulles Greenway; requires advance approval by local government, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Transportation | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2010-12-30 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-12-30 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102735D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB1539 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB1539+hil |