VA HB1539 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB139-Peace) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-04 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB139-Peace) by voice vote
Summary
Income tax; biodiesel fuels producers income tax credit. Allows an income tax credit to biodiesel fuels producers in Virginia who produce at least one million gallons of biodiesel fuels a year. The amount of the credit is $0.01 per gallon annually for taxable years beginning on January 1, 2008, and ending December 31, 2015. Any unused credit may be transferred for use by another taxpayer. This bill was incorporated into
Title
Income tax, state; tax credit for certain biodiesel fuels producers in State.
Sponsors
Del. Brian Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-04 | House: Incorporated by Finance (HB139-Peace) by voice vote | |
2008-01-22 | House: Assigned Finance sub: 3 | |
2008-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2008-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 081916648 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1539 |