VA HB1538 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation bonds; I-81. Authorizes issuance of bonds in an amount up to $2 billion for revenue-producing projects in the Interstate 81 corridor
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Interstate 81 Corridor Bond Act of 2020; created.
Sponsors
Del. Terry Austin [R] | Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporated by Appropriations |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20103929D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1414 (Similar To) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1230)
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1538 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1538+hil |