VA HB1537 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1101)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Memorials for war veterans. Provides that a locality may remove, relocate, contextualize, or cover any monument or memorial for war veterans on the locality's public property, not including a monument or memorial located in a publicly owned cemetery, regardless of when the monument or memorial was erected, and removes certain criminal and civil penalties. Current law makes it unlawful to disturb or interfere with such monuments or memorials or to prevent citizens from taking proper measures and exercising proper means for the protection, preservation, and care of such monuments or memorials. Prior to removing, relocating, contextualizing, or covering any such publicly owned monument or memorial, the local governing body shall publish notice of such intent in a newspaper having general circulation in the locality. The notice shall specify the time and place of a public hearing at which interested persons may present their views, not less than 30 days after publication of the notice. After the completion of the hearing, the governing body may vote whether to remove, relocate, contextualize, or cover the monument or memorial. If the governing body votes to remove, relocate, contextualize, or cover the monument or memorial, the local governing body shall first, for a period of 30 days, offer the monument or memorial for relocation and placement to any museum, historical society, government, or military battlefield. The local governing body shall have sole authority to determine the final disposition of the monument or memorial. The bill authorizes the local governing body to call for an advisory referendum prior to voting on such motion. The bill repeals an 1890 act of assembly related to the placement of a statue in the City of Alexandria and does not apply to a monument or memorial located on the property of a public institution of higher education within the City of Lexington. The bill also provides that the Board of Historic Resources shall promulgate regulations governing the manner in which any monument or memorial may be contextualized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

War memorials for veterans; removal, relocation, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N) (Y: 52 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 96 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-10 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1101)
2020-04-10 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1101 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1537ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-08SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N)
2020-03-07HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 43-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 43-N)
2020-03-07HouseConference substitute printed 20109855D-H2
2020-03-07 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Locke, Bell, Reeves
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-05HouseDelegates: McQuinn, Helmer, Walker
2020-03-05HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-05HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-05SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenate insisted on substitute (25-Y 14-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2020-03-05HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 20109421D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2020-03-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-04SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N)
2020-03-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1537S1
2020-03-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20109421D-S1
2020-03-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-03-04SenateRead third time
2020-03-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-03-02SenateCommittee substitute printed 20109421D-S1
2020-03-02SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 46-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 46-N)
2020-02-10HousePrinted as engrossed 20107987D-EH1
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1537EH1
2020-02-10HouseAmendments by Delegate Poindexter withdrawn
2020-02-10HouseAmendments by Delegate McQuinn agreed to
2020-02-10HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20107987D-H1
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseIncorporates HB1625 (Hudson)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107987D-H1
2020-02-07HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2020-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 20102770D

Same As/Similar To

HB1625 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - Incorporated by Counties, Cities and Towns
SB183 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1100)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521812(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1537&201+sum+HB1537
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1537ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1101+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0065+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0803+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0120+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1479HB1537+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1527HB1537+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1990+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1628HB1537+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV2037+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1878HB1537+HB1537

Bill Comments

feedback