VA HB1537 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Animal boarding establishments; in-home care. Excludes from the definition of "boarding establishment" any private residential dwelling that shelters, feeds, and waters fewer than five companion animals that are not owned by the proprietor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal boarding establishments; clarifies definition of boarding establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0599)
2018-03-30 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 599 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-16 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-16HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018
2018-03-10SenateSigned by President
2018-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-08HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1537ER)
2018-03-08HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18105032D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1537E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-09HouseRead first time
2018-02-07HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18105032D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326500(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1537
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1537+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1537E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1537ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0599+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0101V0030+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H01V0048+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0638+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S01V0106+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0925HB1537+HB1537
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0973HB1537+HB1537

Bill Comments

feedback