VA HB1535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; student discipline. Provides that no student shall receive a long-term suspension or expulsion for disruptive behavior unless such behavior involves intentional physical injury or credible threat of physical injury to another person.
Title
Public schools; student discipline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Education |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102713D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1535 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1535+hil |