VA HB1534 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-25 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-25 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Student discipline; long-term suspension. Reduces the maximum length of a long-term suspension from 364 calendar days to 90 school days. The bill prohibits a long-term suspension from extending beyond any 45 school day period unless the school principal or division superintendent finds that aggravating circumstances exist, as defined by the local school board. The bill requires that the length of any long-term suspension that extends beyond any 45 school day period shall be reviewed at the end of each such period.
Title
Student discipline; long-term suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider insist on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 54-N) (Y: 46 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N) (Y: 49 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 54-N) (Y: 46 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Recommitted to Education and Health |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Motion to reconsider insist on substitute agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (49-Y 49-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105323D-S1 (49-Y 49-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (46-Y 54-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 17105323D-S1 (46-Y 54-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (34-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended HB1534S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105323D-S1 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105323D-S1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 46-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 46-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1534H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17104854D-H1 |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 17104854D-H1 |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102700D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 209.1:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 276.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |