VA HB1533 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; City of Fairfax. Increases the maximum transient occupancy tax that the city may levy from four percent to six percent. Any amount above four percent shall be placed into an economic development opportunity fund to be used solely for economic development, marketing, or tourism initiatives.
Title
Charter; City of Fairfax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1533ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (72-Y 26-N) |
2013-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 26-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (16-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #1 |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102105D |