VA HB1532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1532
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Corrections; earned sentence credits. Establishes a four-level classification system for the awarding and calculation of earned sentence credits. The bill requires the calculation of earned sentence credits to apply retroactively to the entire sentence of any inmate who is confined in a state correctional facility and participating in the earned sentence credit system on July 1, 2020.
Title
Corrections, Department of; earned sentence credits.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Jeffrey Campbell [R] |
Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB1370 (Campbell, J.L.) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20107650D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Public Safety (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2020-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20105202D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1532 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Courts of Justice by voice vote
HB1370 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
HB1370 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice