VA HB1532 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local tax administration; special commissioner to execute title to real estate. Lowers the threshold percentage of taxes and liens together on property from 50 percent to 35 percent of the assessed value of the parcel and, if only taxes, from 25 percent to 15 percent of the assessed value of the parcel in order to allow more properties to be conveyed to the cities of Hopewell, Newport News, Norfolk, Petersburg, and Richmond in lieu of a public sale at auction.
Title
Tax administration, local; special commissioner to execute title to real estate in certain cities.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Algie Howell [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] |
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0688) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 688 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1532ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Miller, J.C. agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11104606D-EH1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1532EH1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Amendment by Delegate Ingram agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104606D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104606D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-12-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-12-27 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102143D |
Subjects
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Hopewell, City of
Newport News, City of
Norfolk, City of
Petersburg, City of
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Richmond, City of
Taxation
Hopewell, City of
Newport News, City of
Norfolk, City of
Petersburg, City of
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Richmond, City of
Taxation