VA HB1527 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and Virginia Freedom of Information Act; training requirements; executive directors and members of industrial development authorities and economic development authorities. Requires the executive director and members of each industrial development authority and economic development authority, as created by the Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act, to take training on the provisions of the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and the Freedom of Information Act at least once every two years. The bill requires such officials in office on July 1, 2020, to complete such training no later than December 31, 2020. Training on the Virginia Freedom of Information Act may be provided online by the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council or the local government attorney. Training on the State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act shall be provided by the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council and may be provided online. The clerk of the respective governing body is responsible for maintaining training records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conflict of Interests Act, State & Local Gov't, and FOIA; training requirements for ex. directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0076)
2020-03-02 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 76 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020
2020-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020
2020-02-21SenateSigned by President
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1527ER)
2020-02-20HouseEnrolled
2020-02-17SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateRead third time
2020-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-12SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2020-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-29HouseVOTE: (98-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-27HouseRead first time
2020-01-23HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement
2020-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2020-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 20105078D

Same As/Similar To

SB701 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0080)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223132(n/a)See Bill Text
223704.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1527
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1527+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1527ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0076+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1104V0011+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1104V0026+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0087+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H11V0117+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0204+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S12V0136+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0655HB1527+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0660HB1527+HB1527

Bill Comments

feedback