VA HB1527 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Leave for volunteer members of Civil Air Patrol. Requires state and private employers to allow officers or employees who are volunteer members of the Civil Air Patrol to take leaves of absence from their respective duties without loss of seniority, accrued leave, benefits, or efficiency rating on all days during which such officer or employee is (i) engaged in training for emergency missions with the Civil Air Patrol, not to exceed 10 workdays per federal fiscal year, or (ii) responding to an emergency mission as a Civil Air Patrol volunteer, not to exceed 30 workdays per federal fiscal year. The bill requires any officer or employee requesting leave to provide certification that the officer or employee has been authorized by the United States Air Force, the Governor, or a department, division, agency, or political subdivision of the state to respond to or train for an emergency mission and verification from the Civil Air Patrol of the emergency need of the officer's or employee's volunteer service. The bill allows employers to treat such leaves of absence as unpaid leave but prohibits employers from requiring an officer or employee to exhaust any other leave to which he is entitled prior to such leaves of absence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Air Patrol; leave for volunteer members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 277 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1527ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-13HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12HousePrinted as engrossed 18104766D-E
2018-02-12HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1527E
2018-02-12HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2018-02-12HouseRead second time
2018-02-10HouseRead first time
2018-02-09HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07HouseAssigned App. sub: Public Safety
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-19HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-19HousePresented and ordered printed 18104766D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222821.3(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.7:6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB1527
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1527+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1527E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB1527ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0277+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0021+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1101V0055+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0095+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0207V0006+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0054+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0699+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0180+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB1527+HB1527
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0620HB1527+HB1527

Bill Comments

feedback