VA HB1527 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Mandatory reports of child abuse or neglect; sex offenses. Provides that for purposes of triggering the duty of a mandatory reporter to report suspected child abuse or neglect to the local department of social services, a reason to suspect that a child is abused or neglected includes a reasonable belief that a sexual act has been committed upon the child in violation of Article 7 (Criminal Sexual Assault) of Chapter 4 of Title 18.2 or the statutes prohibiting indecent liberties with children. The bill also provides that any other person may make a complaint regarding such acts to the local department of social services and provides for the investigation of school personnel suspected of committing such acts. Finally, the bill also provides that all law-enforcement departments and other state and local entities shall cooperate with each child-protective services coordinator in the prevention of such sexual acts being committed upon a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse or neglect; mandatory reports involving sexual offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2015-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2015-01-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2015-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101679D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161241.3(n/a)See Bill Text
6321505(n/a)See Bill Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text
6321507(n/a)See Bill Text
6321509(n/a)See Bill Text
6321510(n/a)See Bill Text
6321511(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback