VA HB1527 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire insurance policy forms. Clarifies that excess fire insurance may be written on an endorsement as well as on a separate policy. The measure also deletes references to primary policies and deletes a requirement that insurers indicate in the heading or title of a readable policy whether the coverage applies on a primary or excess basis.
Title
Fire insurance; clarifies that excess insurance may be written on an endorsement, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 12 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1527ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-16 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2013-01-16 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2013-01-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-14 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102410D |